EP0496124 - Roller mill [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.1996 [1996/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/31] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Hirohisa, c/o Nagasaki Technical Inst. of Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K., 717-1, Fukahori-machi 5-chome, Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Tsugio, c/o Nagasaki Technical Inst. of Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K., 717-1, Fukahori-machi 5-chome, Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | 03 /
Kinoshita, Masaaki, c/o Nagasaki Shipyard & Engine Works, Mitsubishi Jukogyo KK., 1-1, Akunoura-machi Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | 04 /
Sakamoto, Hidenori, c/o Nagasaki Shipyard & Engine Works, Mitsubishi Jukogyo KK., 1-1, Akunoura-machi Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | 05 /
Kunimoto, Takeshi, c/o Mitsubishi Jukogyo K. K. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/31] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/31] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91122397.2 | 30.12.1991 | [1992/31] | Priority number, date | JP19910005330 | 21.01.1991 Original published format: JP 533091 | [1992/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0496124 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0496124 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B02C15/00, B02C23/32, B07B7/083 | [1992/31] | CPC: |
B02C15/04 (EP);
B02C23/32 (EP);
B07B7/083 (EP);
B02C2015/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1992/31] | Title | German: | Wälzmühle | [1992/31] | English: | Roller mill | [1992/31] | French: | Broyeur à galets | [1992/31] | Examination procedure | 27.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/31] | 28.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3125850 ; | [A]FR1448417 ; | [A]DE1938772 ; | [A]EP0325770 ; | [A]US4981269 ; | [AP]DE4002867 |