EP0494459 - Distinctive ring system for a cordless telephone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.1997 | Correction of patent application | published on 03.12.1997 [1997/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. 600 North Sherman Drive Indianapolis Indiana 46201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/29] | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. 600 North Sherman Drive Indianapolis Indiana 46201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCarthy, Dennis Ronald 4852 Pembridge Circle Syracuse, New York 13215 / US | [1992/29] | Representative(s) | Einsel, Robert Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Göttinger Chaussee 76 30453 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/29] | Einsel, Robert, Dipl.-Ing. Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Göttinger Chaussee 76 D-30453 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 91122412.9 | 31.12.1991 | [1992/29] | Priority number, date | US19910638979 | 09.01.1991 Original published format: US 638979 | [1992/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0494459 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0494459 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | [1997/49] | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/72 | [1992/29] | CPC: |
H04M1/72505 (EP);
H04M1/00 (KR);
H04M19/04 (EP);
H04M1/57 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/29] | Title | German: | Unterscheidbares Rufsystem für ein schnurloses Telefon | [1992/29] | English: | Distinctive ring system for a cordless telephone | [1992/29] | French: | Système de sonnerie distinctive pour un téléphone sans fil | [1992/29] | File destroyed: | 28.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 16.11.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |