EP0440300 - Electrodeless low-pressure discharge lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1996 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kroes, Anthony c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1991/32] | Representative(s) | Rooda, Hans, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | Rooda, Hans, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 91200177.3 | 30.01.1991 | [1991/32] | Priority number, date | NL19900000259 | 02.02.1990 Original published format: NL 9000259 | [1991/32] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0440300 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0440300 | Date: | 26.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01J65/04 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
H01J65/048 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/32] | Title | German: | Elektrodenlose Niederdruckentladungslampe | [1991/32] | English: | Electrodeless low-pressure discharge lamp | [1991/32] | French: | Lampe à décharge à basse pression sans électrodes | [1991/32] | Examination procedure | 10.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/25] | 07.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.03.1992 | M01   Fee paid on   10.04.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 26.04.1995 | FR | 26.04.1995 | NL | 26.04.1995 | DE | 27.07.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | BE | 26.04.1995 | |
NL | 26.04.1995 | ||
DE | 27.07.1995 | ||
FR | 22.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/05] | BE | 26.04.1995 | |
DE | 27.07.1995 | ||
FR | 22.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/01] | DE | 27.07.1995 | |
FR | 22.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/01] | DE | 27.07.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0298538 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) |