EP0445852 - Detergent composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.06.1994 [1994/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sara Lee/DE N.V. Keulsekade 143 3532 AA Utrecht / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | For all designated states Sara Lee/DE N.V. Keulsekade 143 NL-3532 AA Utrecht / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pronk, Johannes Hoekerkade 110 NL-2725 AM Zoetermeer / NL | 02 /
Cornelissens, Emery George Philomena Schuylenburgh 4 NL-2631 CN Nootdorp / NL | [1991/37] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 91200232.6 | 05.02.1991 | [1991/37] | Priority number, date | NL19900000272 | 05.02.1990 Original published format: NL 9000272 | [1991/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0445852 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/37, C11D3/10, C11D3/08 | [1991/37] | CPC: |
C11D3/378 (EP);
C11D3/08 (EP);
C11D3/10 (EP);
C11D3/3761 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/37] | Title | German: | Waschmittel | [1991/37] | English: | Detergent composition | [1991/37] | French: | Composition détergente | [1991/37] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 04.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/49] | 24.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2165945 (HENKEL & CIE GMBH); | [Y]EP0080222 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [X]EP0221776 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al); | [Y]US4692275 (SECEMSKI ISAAC I [US], et al); | [X]DE3627773 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [X]DE3743739 (BASF AG [DE]); | [AD]DE3825858 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) |