EP0442570 - Damper for the steering gear of a car [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.1993 [1993/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLVO CAR SINT-TRUIDEN, naamloze vennootschap Rellestraat 2 3800 Sint-Truiden / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | For all designated states VOLVO CAR SINT-TRUIDEN, naamloze vennootschap Rellestraat 2 B-3800 Sint-Truiden / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sliwinski, Marc Wijngaardstraat 4 B-3580 Neerpelt / BE | [1991/34] | Representative(s) | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv. Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv Arenbergstraat 13 B-2000 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 91200278.9 | 09.02.1991 | [1991/34] | Priority number, date | BE19900000164 | 14.02.1990 Original published format: BE 9000164 | [1991/34] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0442570 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B62D7/22 | [1991/34] | CPC: |
F16F1/40 (EP);
B62D3/123 (EP);
B62D7/22 (EP);
F16F15/023 (EP);
F16F9/532 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/34] | Title | German: | Lenkungsdämpfer für Personenkraftwagen | [1991/34] | English: | Damper for the steering gear of a car | [1991/34] | French: | Amortisseur de direction de véhicule | [1991/34] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 02.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/44] | 09.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/20] | 18.12.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP023718 ; | [X]GB2087513 ; | [A]DE3726031 ; | [A]EP0025425 ; | [Y]US4588198 ; | [A]FR2625779 ; | [AP]EP0396354 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 376 (M-862)(3724) 21 August 1989, & JP-A-O1 131348 (ISHII_KOGYO) 24 May 1989, | [Y] - MACHINE DESIGN. vol. 60, no. 2, 21 January 1988, CLEVELAND US T.G.Duclos et al.: ""Fluids that thicken electrically"" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 135 (M-949)(4078) 14 March 1990, & JP-A-02 3718 (KABAYA IND CO LTD) 09 January 1990,, & JP023718 A 19900109 |