EP0442583 - Powder coating based on a carboxyl-functional polyester and an epoxy-functional cross-linking agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.1994 [1994/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM N.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states DSM N.V. Het Overloon 1 NL-6411 TE Heerlen / NL | ||
Former [1991/34] | For all designated states STAMICARBON B.V. Mijnweg 1 NL-6167 AC Geleen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van den Elshout, Wilhelmus H. H. A. Walramstraat 128-18 NL-6131 BP Sittard / NL | 02 /
Wories, Herman Jelle Romulushof 43 NL-6215 EJ Maastricht / NL | 03 /
Misev, Tosko Alexander Rengersdiep 6 NL-8032 NK Zwolle / NL | [1991/34] | Application number, filing date | 91200304.3 | 13.02.1991 | [1991/34] | Priority number, date | NL19900000370 | 16.02.1990 Original published format: NL 9000370 | NL19900000371 | 16.02.1990 Original published format: NL 9000371 | [1991/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0442583 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C09D163/00, C09D167/00, C08G18/28, C09D5/03, C08G59/40, C07D303/16, C08G18/10, C08G59/42 | [1991/34] | CPC: |
C08G18/10 (EP,US);
C07D303/16 (EP,US);
C08G59/02 (EP,US);
C09D163/00 (EP,US);
C09D167/00 (EP,US);
C08G2150/20 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/2845 (EP,US);
C09D163/00, C08L2666/18 (US,EP);
C09D167/00, C08L2666/36 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/34] | Title | German: | Pulverbeschichtungsmittel bestehend aus carboxylgruppenhaltigem Polyester und Epoxy-Vernetzer | [1991/34] | English: | Powder coating based on a carboxyl-functional polyester and an epoxy-functional cross-linking agent | [1991/34] | French: | Revêtement pulvérulent à base d'un polyester carboxylé et d'un agent de réticulation époxydé | [1991/34] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 13.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/11] | 19.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/48] | 30.06.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3142686 (KREPS ROBERT W F, et al); | [Y]FR2108217 (KOLBEL HERBERT); | [Y]FR2322172 (NIPPON ESTER CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]US4732853 (WHITESIDES GEORGE M [US], et al) |