EP0443670 - Lock nut having high resistance to loosening [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.1993 [1993/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.I.M.A. COMPAGNIA ITALIANA MOLLE ACCIAIO S.P.A. Via Piave 66 I-20040 Busnago Milan / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/35] | For all designated states C.I.M.A. COMPAGNIA ITALIANA MOLLE ACCIAIO S.P.A. Via Piave 66 I-20040 Busnago, Milan / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Minola, Antonio Via Castello, 24 I-20040 Bellusco, Milan / IT | [1991/35] | Representative(s) | Henke, Erwin, et al Ing.Barzanò & Zanardo S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/35] | Henke, Erwin, et al Ing.Barzanò & Zanardo S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 91200314.2 | 14.02.1991 | [1991/35] | Priority number, date | IT19900019426 | 20.02.1990 Original published format: IT 1942690 | [1991/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0443670 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16B37/12 | [1991/35] | CPC: |
F16B39/284 (EP);
F16B37/12 (EP);
F16B39/36 (EP);
F16B2/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/35] | Title | German: | Sicherungsmutter mit hohem Lösewiderstand | [1991/35] | English: | Lock nut having high resistance to loosening | [1991/35] | French: | Ecrou de blocage ayant une grande résistance à l'ouverture | [1991/35] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 24.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/13] | 04.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/49] | 29.06.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1993/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2904800 (PETERSON CHARLES D); | [A]US3461935 (MONTICELLI GIULIO); | [A]US4298297 (COURSON RICHARD B); | [AP]EP0371579 (PAC FASTENERS [US]) |