Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] |
09.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.1996 [1996/13] |
21.08.1995 | Change - representative | published on 11.10.1995 [1995/41] |
17.02.1995 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.04.1995 [1995/14] |
09.11.1993 | First examination report | |
02.09.1992 | Request for examination filed | published on 21.10.1992 [1992/43] |
13.01.1992 | Publication of search report | published on 04.03.1992 [1992/10] |
18.07.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.09.1991 [1991/36] |