EP0502262 - Ion exchange resin holder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.1995 [1995/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT naamloze vennootschap Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
Former [1992/37] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT naamloze vennootschap Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Niel, Marc Alfons Kerselarenlaan 190 B-1200 Brussel / BE | 02 /
de Ruijter, Dirk Florent Maarschalk Montgomerylaan 5 B-2100 Deurne / BE | 03 /
Vackier, Leo Norbert Zonneweelde 6 B-2970 's Gravenwezel / BE | 04 /
Verlinden, Bart Julianus E. Jaminéstraat 52, B10 B-3700 Tongeren / BE | [1992/37] | Application number, filing date | 91200482.7 | 06.03.1991 | [1992/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0502262 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0502262 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B01J47/02, B01J47/10 | [1992/37] | CPC: |
B01J47/022 (EP,US);
B01J47/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT [1992/45] |
Former [1992/37] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Halter für Ionenaustauschharze | [1992/37] | English: | Ion exchange resin holder | [1992/37] | French: | Récipient de résines échangeuses d'ions | [1992/37] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1992 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, ES, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE | 29.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/13] | 14.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.04.1992 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.1992 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.1992 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.1992 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.1992 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.1992 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.1992 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.04.1992 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3200067 (LEVENDUSKY JOSEPH A); | [A]US3773889 (GEORGE D, et al) |