EP0445894 - Use of tumor necrosis factor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/37] | Methods for the treatment of demyelinating disease, uveitis, or graft-versus-host-disease | ||
[1995/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.01.1996 [1996/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI KASEI KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka / JP | [1991/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Otsuka, Yoshiki Asahi Kasei 5 Ryo, 100 Kawanarijima Fuji-shi, Shizuoka-ken 416 / JP | 02 /
Hori, Kazuyoshi 322-77, Iwamoto Fuji-shi, Shizuoka-ken 416 / JP | 03 /
Hayashi, Hiroshi 3989-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi, Shizuoka-ken 417 / JP | [1991/37] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 91200520.4 | 08.03.1991 | [1991/37] | Priority number, date | JP19900056734 | 09.03.1990 Original published format: JP 5673490 | JP19900056735 | 09.03.1990 Original published format: JP 5673590 | JP19900056736 | 09.03.1990 Original published format: JP 5673690 | [1991/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0445894 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0445894 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0445894 | Date: | 08.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/525, A61K38/19 | [1995/06] | CPC: |
A61K38/191 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/37] | C07K15/00, A61K37/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/37] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Tumornekrosefaktor | [1995/06] | English: | Use of tumor necrosis factor | [1995/06] | French: | Application du facteur de nécrose de tumeurs | [1995/06] |
Former [1991/37] | Methode zur Behandlung von Demyelinisierungskrankheiten, Uveitis oder Graft-Versus-Host-Krankheiten | ||
Former [1991/37] | Methods for the treatment of demyelinating disease, uveitis, or graft-versus-host-disease | ||
Former [1991/37] | Méthode de traitement des maladies démyelinisantes, de l'uvéite et des rejets de greffe | Examination procedure | 08.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/37] | 15.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0325471 (COLLAGEN CORP [US]); | [X]EP0308378 (YEDA RES & DEV [IL]) | [XP] - International Immunology, Vol. 2, No. 9, 1990, USA, pages 909-913; PAYA C.V. et al.: "Inhibition of Theiler's virus-induced demyelination in vivo by tumor necrosis factor alpha", the whole document. | [X] - Journal of Immunology, Vol. 144, No. 1, 1 January 1990, pages 129-135, Baltimore, US; SELMAJ K.W. et al.: "Proliferation of strocytes in vitro in response to cytokines. A primary role for tumor necrosis factor", page 135. | [A] - Biosis Previews Database Biosis, Philadelphia, PA, US; KULKARNI P.S. et al.: "Cachectin a novel polypeptide induces uvcitis in the rabbit eye", & Exp. Eye. Res. 46 (4) 1988, 631-34. | [A] - Biosis Previews Database Biosis, Philadelphia, PA, US, Accession No. 7127480, Abstract No. 88050225; SHALABY M.R. et al.: "Prevention of graft-versus-host reaction in newborn mice by antibodies to tumor necrosis factor alpha", & Transplantation, 47 (6), 1989, 1057-1061. | [A] - Biosis Previews Database Biosis, Philadelphia, PA, US, Accession No. 6437344, Abstract No. 85037865; PIGUET P.F. et al.: "Tumor-necrosis factor-cachectin is an effector of skin and gut lesions of the acute phase of graft-vs.-host disease", & J. Exp. Med. 166 (5), 1987, 1280-1289. | Examination | - Biosis Previews Database, Biosis, Philadelphia, PA, US; Kulkarni P S et al.: "Cachetin a novel polypeptide induces uvcitis in the rabbit eye" | - Biosis Previews Database, Biosis, Philadelphia, PA, US, accession No. 6437344, Piguet P F et al.:"Tumor necrosis factor-cachetin is an effector of skin and gut lesions of the acute phase of graft-vs.-host disease |