Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
26.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.06.1996 [1996/24] |
15.03.1996 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 01.05.1996 [1996/18] |
04.05.1995 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.06.1995 [1995/25] |
25.11.1993 | First examination report | |
10.04.1992 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.05.1992 [1992/22] |
13.09.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.10.1991 [1991/44] |