Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0454199 | Global Dossier | 21.06.1995 | B1 | EP0454199 | 30.10.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | BE9000463 | 27.04.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BE1004150 | 29.09.1992 | A3 | Priority number | Date | BE9000463 | 27.04.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69110536T | 18.01.1996 | T2 | DE69110536D1 | 27.07.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | BE9000463 | 27.04.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5137059 | 11.08.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | BE9000463 | 27.04.1990 |