EP0451920 - Styrene-isoprene-styrene block copolymer composition for low viscosity low application temperature hot melt adhesives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.06.2000 [2000/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/28] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1991/42] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chin, Steven Soohyun 15250 Gray Ridge Drive No. 622 Houston, Texas 77082 / US | [1991/42] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1992/01] |
Former [1991/42] | Tuijn, Jan Warnaar, et al Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Intellectual Property Division P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 91200826.5 | 09.04.1991 | [1991/42] | Priority number, date | US19900510905 | 11.04.1990 Original published format: US 510905 | [1991/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0451920 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0451920 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0451920 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08F297/04, C09J153/02, C08L53/02 | [1991/42] | CPC: |
C08F297/046 (EP,US);
C09J125/08 (KR);
C09J153/02 (EP,US);
C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09J153/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/42] | Title | German: | Styrol-Isopren-Styrolblockcopolymerzusammensetzung für Niedrigviskose-, Niedrigtemperatur-Heissschmelzklebemittel | [1991/42] | English: | Styrene-isoprene-styrene block copolymer composition for low viscosity low application temperature hot melt adhesives | [1991/42] | French: | Composition de copolymère bloc styrène-isoprène-styrène pour adhésifs thermofusibles à faible température d'application et faible vicosité | [1991/42] | Examination procedure | 14.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/38] | 01.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0171225 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD [JP]); | [XP]WO9102039 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US], et al); | [XD]US4096203 (ST CLAIR DAVID J) |