EP0454208 - Device for moving the luminous beam in a projector, in particular a medium or high-powered projector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPACE CANNON VH S.r.l. Regione Belvedere Strada Provinciale per Fubine I-15043 FUBINE (Alessandria) / IT | [1991/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bruno, Baiardi, c/o SPACE CANNON VH S.r.l. 144, Corso Roma I-15100 Alessandria / IT | 02 /
Renato, Parola, c/o SPACE CANNON VH S.r.l. 144, Corso Roma I-15100 Alessandria / IT | [1991/44] | Representative(s) | Corradini, Corrado, et al Ing. C. Corradini & C. S.r.l. Via Dante Alighieri 4 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Corradini, Corrado, et al Ing. C. CORRADINI & C. S.r.l. Via Dante Alighieri 4 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | ||
Former [1991/44] | Corradini, Corrado, et al 4, Via Dante Alighieri I-42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | Application number, filing date | 91200839.8 | 10.04.1991 | [1991/44] | Priority number, date | IT19900046830 | 26.04.1990 Original published format: IT 4683090 | [1991/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0454208 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0454208 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F21P3/00 | [1991/44] | CPC: |
F21S10/00 (EP);
F21V21/30 (EP);
F21W2131/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/44] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Lenken des Strahlenbündels eines Projektors, insbesondere mittlerer oder hoher Leistung | [1991/44] | English: | Device for moving the luminous beam in a projector, in particular a medium or high-powered projector | [1991/44] | French: | Dispositif de déplacement du faisceau lumineux d'un projecteur, en particulier d'un projecteur de puissance moyenne ou élevée | [1991/44] | Examination procedure | 12.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/18] | 27.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 07.12.1994 | [2000/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2345382 (BRUCE CRAMER); | [A]US4298911 (HEADRICK RICHARD T); | [A]US4344117 (NICCUM RICHARD) |