EP0460726 - Formation of potassium tantalate niobate thin films by metallorganic deposition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.12.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 01.02.1995 [1995/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/50] | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Micheli, Adolph Louis 38900 Elmite Mt. Clemens, MI 48045 / US | 02 /
Schubring, Norman William 2723 Avonhurst Drive Troy, MI 48084 / US | 03 /
Mantese, Joseph Vito 3255 Wolverine Troy, MI 46083 / US | 04 /
Catalan, Antonio Buddy 3658 Merrimac Sterling Heights, MI 4831D / US | [1991/50] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/50] | Haines, Arthur Donald, et al Patent Section 1st Floor Gideon House 28 Chapel Street Luton, Bedfordshire LU1 2SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91201165.7 | 15.05.1991 | [1991/50] | Priority number, date | US19900533213 | 04.06.1990 Original published format: US 533213 | [1991/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0460726 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C23C18/12 | [1991/50] | CPC: |
C23C18/1216 (EP);
C23C18/1225 (EP);
C23C18/1279 (EP);
H10N15/15 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/50] | Title | German: | Bildung von Kalium-Tantalat-Niobat enthaltenden dünnen Schichten durch metallorganische Aufbringung | [1991/50] | English: | Formation of potassium tantalate niobate thin films by metallorganic deposition | [1991/50] | French: | Formation de films minces de tantalate niobate de potassium par dépôt à partir d'un composé organométallique | [1991/50] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 27.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/09] | 12.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.09.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/05] | 12.09.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3047424 (SUCHOFF LYDIA A); | [A]US3293557 (DENTON RICHARD T); | [A]FR2498817 (SOLAREX CORP [US]) |