EP0461691 - Tray with cover provided with guarantee closure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.1995 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.07.1995 [1995/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MPG MANIFATTURA PLASTICA S.R.L. Via Carlo Noè 24 21013 Gallarate-Varese / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/51] | For all designated states MPG MANIFATTURA PLASTICA S.R.L. Via Carlo Noè 24 I-21013 Gallarate-Varese / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Perego, Mario Via San Francesco 3 I-21013 Gallarate-Varese / IT | 02 /
Perego, Giampiero Largo Francesco Verrotti di Pianella 7 I-21013 Gallarate-Varese / IT | [1991/51] | Representative(s) | Fusina, Gerolamo, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A, Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/28] | Fusina, Gerolamo, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A, Via Borgonuovo, 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1991/51] | De Carli, Erberto ING. BARZANO & ZANARDO MILANO S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 91201235.8 | 24.05.1991 | [1991/51] | Priority number, date | IT19900021360U | 13.06.1990 Original published format: IT 2136090 U | [1991/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0461691 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0461691 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0461691 | Date: | 13.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65D43/06, B65D77/04, // B65D101:00 | [1991/51] | CPC: |
B65D43/0268 (EP);
B65D77/046 (EP);
B65D2401/15 (EP);
B65D2543/00027 (EP);
B65D2543/00194 (EP);
B65D2543/00296 (EP);
B65D2543/00425 (EP);
B65D2543/00509 (EP);
B65D2543/00537 (EP);
B65D2543/00555 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/51] | Title | German: | Behälter und Deckel versehen mit einem Originalverschluss | [1991/51] | English: | Tray with cover provided with guarantee closure | [1991/51] | French: | Barquette et couvercle présentant une garantie de fermeture | [1991/51] | Examination procedure | 09.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/32] | 09.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2941660 [ ] (TUPPER EARL S); | US2998158 [ ] (TUPPER EARL S); | US3321104 [ ] (BRYANT EDWARDS); | US3722731 [ ] (MC CORMICK R, et al); | US3732909 [ ] (ROOKE R, et al); | US4006839 [ ] (THIEL ALFONS W, et al); | DE2821260 [ ] (VULLIEZ); | GB2040267 [ ] (DRG UK LTD) |