EP0460745 - Process for regenerating, by means of hydrogen peroxide, spent sulphuric acid from nitration reactions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.1994 [1994/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENICHEM SYNTHESIS S.p.A. Via Ruggero Settimo 55 90139 Palermo / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/50] | For all designated states ENICHEM SYNTHESIS S.p.A. Via Ruggero Settimo 55 I-90139 Palermo / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Villanti, Alberto Viale delle Rimembranze di Lambrate 9 I-20134 Milano / IT | [1991/50] | Representative(s) | De Carli, Erberto, et al ING. BARZANO & ZANARDO MILANO S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | De Carli, Erberto, et al ING. BARZANO & ZANARDO MILANO S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1991/50] | Roggero, Sergio Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 91201325.7 | 31.05.1991 | [1991/50] | Priority number, date | IT19900020552 | 05.06.1990 Original published format: IT 2055290 | [1991/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0460745 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C01B17/94 | [1991/50] | CPC: |
C01B17/94 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1991/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Regenerieren von verbrauchten Schwefelsäuren aus Nitrierungsreaktionenmittels Wasserstoffperoxyd | [1991/50] | English: | Process for regenerating, by means of hydrogen peroxide, spent sulphuric acid from nitration reactions | [1991/50] | French: | Procédé pour régénérer, au moyen de péroxyde hydrogène, de l'acide sulfurique usé provenant de réactions de nitrations | [1991/50] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 16.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/11] | 30.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/30] | 15.02.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2404613 (AIR PROD & CHEM); | [A]DE2020867 |