EP0469649 - Calorimeter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1997 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.1997 [1997/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKYO GAS CO., LTD. 5-20, Kaigan 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0022 / JP | For all designated states Oval Engineering Co., Ltd. 10-8 Kamiochiai 3-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/06] | For all designated states TOKYO GAS CO., LTD. 5-20, Kaigan 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | ||
For all designated states Oval Engineering Co., Ltd. 10-8 Kamiochiai 3-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nukui, Kazumitu 9-10 Misondai Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Matubara, Naoki 10-8 Kamiochiai 3-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [1992/06] | Representative(s) | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/06] | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 91201450.3 | 11.06.1991 | [1992/06] | Priority number, date | JP19900205378 | 02.08.1990 Original published format: JP 20537890 | [1992/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0469649 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0469649 | Date: | 27.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0469649 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01N25/48, G01N33/22 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
G01N33/225 (EP,US);
G01K17/10 (KR);
G01K17/00 (KR);
G01N25/48 (KR);
G01N33/22 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1992/06] | G01N25/48 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1992/06] | Title | German: | Kalorimeter | [1992/06] | English: | Calorimeter | [1992/06] | French: | Calorimètre | [1992/06] | Examination procedure | 11.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/15] | 29.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2928739 (RUHRGAS AG); | [A]US4386858 (KUDE WILLIAM B, et al); | [A]FR2640754 (ELF AQUITAINE [FR]); | [A]EP0285959 (GEN SIGNAL CORP [US]) |