EP0464900 - 2-Biphenyl-carbapenems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.1997 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.1997 [1997/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dininno, Frank P. 5 Benjamin Court Old Bridge, NJ 08857 / US | 02 /
Salzmann, Thomas N. 154 Meadowbrook Drive North Plainfield, NJ 07062 / US | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | Thompson, John, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | Thompson, John Dr., et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 91201566.6 | 20.06.1991 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | US19900543946 | 26.06.1990 Original published format: US 543946 | US19900594767 | 09.10.1990 Original published format: US 594767 | [1992/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0464900 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0464900 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D477/00, A61K31/40 | [1992/02] | CPC: |
C07D477/14 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/02] | Title | German: | 2-Biphenyl-Carbapeneme | [1992/02] | English: | 2-Biphenyl-carbapenems | [1992/02] | French: | 2-Biphényl-carbapénèmes | [1992/02] | Examination procedure | 03.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/04] | 17.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/40] | 05.05.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0010316 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [AP]US5004739 (DININNO FRANK P [US], et al); | [AP]US5006519 (DININNO FRANK P [US], et al); | [AP]US5011832 (DININNO FRANK P [US], et al) | by applicant | US4543257 | US4260627 | EP0277743 | US4269772 | US4350631 | US4383946 | US4414155 | BE900718 | JPS60163882 | US4309438 | US4479947 | EP0007614 | EP0072014 | - N. MIYAURA; T. YANAGI; A. SUZUKI, SYN. COMM., (1981), vol. 11, page 513 | - Y. HATANAKA; S. FUKUSHIMA; T. HIYAMA, CHEM. LETT., (1989), vol. 1711 | - L.D. CAMA ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1983), vol. 39, page 2531 | - R.N. GUTHIKONDA ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1987), vol. 30, page 871 | - D.G. MELILLO ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1980), vol. 21, page 2783 | - T. SALZMANN ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1980), vol. 102, page 6161 | - L. M. FUENTES; I. SHINKAI; T. N. SALZMANN, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1986), vol. 108, page 4675 | - J. G. DEVRIES ET AL., HETEROCYCLES, (1985), vol. 23, no. 8, page 1915 | - MCCOMBIE; JEFFREY, J. 0RG. CHEM., (1983), vol. 47, page 2505 | - D.J. BYRON ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC. (C), (1966), vol. 840 | - C. DELL'ERBA; G. GARBARINO; G. GUANTI, TETRAHEDRON, (1971), vol. 27, page 113 | - C. DELL 'ERBA ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1971), vol. 27, page 113 | US19900485096 |