EP0455313 - Process for polymerization of olefins and polymerization catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1997 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.1997 [1997/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [1991/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kioka, Mamoru 9-61, Nishimi 2-chome Iwakuni-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 02 /
Kashiwa, Norio 18-22, Yamate-cho 1-chome Iwakuni-shi, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | [1991/45] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/31] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1991/45] | Myerscough, Philip Boyd J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 91201599.7 | 11.03.1988 | [1991/45] | Priority number, date | JP19870056726 | 13.03.1987 Original published format: JP 5672687 | JP19870056727 | 13.03.1987 Original published format: JP 5672787 | [1991/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0455313 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0455313 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/646, C08F10/00 | [1991/45] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F4/58 (KR);
Y10S526/904 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/6465 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/45] | Title | German: | Polymerisationsverfahren und Polymerisationskatalysator | [1991/45] | English: | Process for polymerization of olefins and polymerization catalyst | [1991/45] | French: | Procédé de polymérisation d'oléfines et catalyseur de polymérisation | [1991/45] | Examination procedure | 14.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/24] | 13.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP88302168.5 / EP0282341 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2516520 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [A]EP0115195 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [X]EP0147053 (TOA NENRYO KOGYO KK [JP]) |