EP0464954 - Apparatus for transplant propagation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.02.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1996 | Refusal of application | published on 03.04.1996 [1996/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Simon, Edward John 1015A Greenwood Road Elk California 95432 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states Simon, Edward John 1015A Greenwood Road Elk, California 95432 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | Hoorweg, Petrus Nicolaas, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | Hoorweg, Petrus Nicolaas, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinkplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 91201729.0 | 03.07.1991 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | US19900549454 | 06.07.1990 Original published format: US 549454 | [1992/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0464954 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0464954 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/10 | [1992/02] | CPC: |
A01G9/086 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/02] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für die Vermehrung durch Verpflanzen | [1992/02] | English: | Apparatus for transplant propagation | [1992/02] | French: | Appareil de propagation par transplant | [1992/02] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 18.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/02] | 14.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.11.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1996/14] | 13.11.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1995 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8910683 ; | [A]EP0030873 ; | [A]EP0213420 ; | [A]GB2088186 ; | [A]US4395846 |