EP0476734 - Dispersion strengthened lead-tin alloy solder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR, NL | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/13] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Betrabet, Hemant c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Boser, Otmar c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Kane, Robert c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
McGee, Susan c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
Caulfield, Thomas c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1992/13] | Representative(s) | Stolk, Steven Adolph, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/42] | Stolk, Steven Adolph, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. P.O. Box 220 NL-5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1992/13] | Weening, Cornelis INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 91202114.4 | 20.08.1991 | [1992/13] | Priority number, date | US19900573440 | 27.08.1990 Original published format: US 573440 | [1992/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0476734 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0476734 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B23K35/26 | [1992/13] | CPC: |
B23K35/24 (KR);
B23K35/262 (EP,US);
B23K35/268 (EP,US);
H05K3/3463 (EP,US);
H05K3/3485 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0215 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/13] | Title | German: | Dispersionsverstärkte Blei-Zinn-Legierung | [1992/13] | English: | Dispersion strengthened lead-tin alloy solder | [1992/13] | French: | Soudure tendre en alliage plomb-étain renforcé par dispersion | [1992/13] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 24.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/49] | 09.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 22.03.1995 | NL | 22.03.1995 | DE | 23.06.1995 | GB | 20.08.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [2000/27] | DE | 23.06.1995 | |
FR | 18.08.1995 | ||
GB | 20.08.1995 | ||
NL | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/30] | DE | 23.06.1995 | |
FR | 18.08.1995 | ||
GB | 20.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/01] | DE | 23.06.1995 | |
FR | 18.08.1995 | ||
Former [1995/52] | FR | 18.08.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JP54152493 ; | [A]JP58038693 ; | [A]JP62197292 ; | [X]US3467765 (CROFT HARRY P); | [Y]EP0198353 (IBM [US]); | [A]DE1204500 (G LAUBMEYER DR, et al); | [A]US3839023 (ERDMANN JESNITZER F, et al) | [YD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 4, no. 11 (E-168)26 January 1980 & JP-A-54 152 493 ( SEIKO EPSON ) 30 November 1979, & JP54152493 A 19791130 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 120 (M-217)(1265) 25 May 1983 & JP-A-58 038 693 ( PIONEER ) 7 March 1983, & JP58038693 A 19830307 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 45 (M-667)(2892) 10 February 1988 & JP-A-62 197 292 ( MITSUBISHI METAL ) 31 August 1987, & JP62197292 A 19870831 | Examination | JP54152493 | - January 1980 &JP-A-54 152 493 ( SEIKO EPSON ) 30 November 1979, & JP54152493 A 19791130 |