EP0473231 - Electromagnetic support with unilateral control currents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.1995 | Change - withdrawal | published on 15.03.1995 [1995/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cox, Hendrikus Herman Marie c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
van Eijk, Jan c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1992/10] | Representative(s) | Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | Cuppens, Hubertus Martinus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 91202146.6 | 22.08.1991 | [1992/10] | Priority number, date | NL19900001909 | 30.08.1990 Original published format: NL 9001909 | [1992/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0473231 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16C39/06 | [1992/10] | CPC: |
F16C32/0451 (EP,US);
F16C32/0614 (EP,US);
F16C32/0666 (EP,US);
F16C29/025 (EP,US);
F16C32/0446 (EP,US);
F16C32/0476 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/10] | Title | German: | Elektromagnetische Unterstützung mit einseitigen Regelströmen | [1992/10] | English: | Electromagnetic support with unilateral control currents | [1992/10] | French: | Support électromagnétique à courants de réglage à une alternance | [1992/10] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 14.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/51] | 01.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.10.1992 | M01   Fee paid on   14.10.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2807044 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM); | [A]US3172025 (JONES CLARENCE S, et al); | [A]GB2095004 (EUROP PROPULSION); | [A]US4417772 (ROBINSON ALAN A [NL]) |