EP0529153 - Method for processing garbage, particularly plastic [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Doleh, Zakaria Kalil P.O. Box 1566 Dubai / AE | [1993/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/09] | Representative(s) | Hoijtink, Reinoud, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Hoijtink, Reinoud, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 91202162.3 | 23.08.1991 | [1993/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0529153 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0529153 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B09B3/00, B09B1/00 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
B29B17/0026 (EP,US);
B09B1/00 (EP,US);
B09B3/20 (EP,US);
B29K2705/00 (EP,US);
Y02W30/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung von Abfall, insbesondere Kunststoffabfall | [1993/09] | English: | Method for processing garbage, particularly plastic | [1993/09] | French: | Procédé de traitement de déchets, en particulier de matière plastique | [1993/09] | Examination procedure | 01.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/22] | 26.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.1995 | BE | 08.03.1995 | CH | 08.03.1995 | DK | 08.03.1995 | ES | 08.03.1995 | FR | 08.03.1995 | GR | 08.03.1995 | IT | 08.03.1995 | LI | 08.03.1995 | NL | 08.03.1995 | SE | 08.06.1995 | GB | 23.08.1995 | LU | 31.08.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/11] | AT | 08.03.1995 | |
BE | 08.03.1995 | ||
CH | 08.03.1995 | ||
DK | 08.03.1995 | ||
ES | 08.03.1995 | ||
GR | 08.03.1995 | ||
IT | 08.03.1995 | ||
LI | 08.03.1995 | ||
NL | 08.03.1995 | ||
SE | 08.06.1995 | ||
FR | 04.08.1995 | ||
GB | 23.08.1995 | ||
LU | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 08.03.1995 | |
BE | 08.03.1995 | ||
CH | 08.03.1995 | ||
DK | 08.03.1995 | ||
ES | 08.03.1995 | ||
GR | 08.03.1995 | ||
IT | 08.03.1995 | ||
LI | 08.03.1995 | ||
SE | 08.06.1995 | ||
FR | 04.08.1995 | ||
GB | 23.08.1995 | ||
LU | 31.08.1995 | ||
NL | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [2000/27] | AT | 08.03.1995 | |
BE | 08.03.1995 | ||
CH | 08.03.1995 | ||
DK | 08.03.1995 | ||
GR | 08.03.1995 | ||
IT | 08.03.1995 | ||
LI | 08.03.1995 | ||
SE | 08.06.1995 | ||
FR | 04.08.1995 | ||
GB | 23.08.1995 | ||
LU | 31.08.1995 | ||
NL | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 08.03.1995 | |
BE | 08.03.1995 | ||
CH | 08.03.1995 | ||
DK | 08.03.1995 | ||
GR | 08.03.1995 | ||
IT | 08.03.1995 | ||
LI | 08.03.1995 | ||
SE | 08.06.1995 | ||
FR | 04.08.1995 | ||
GB | 23.08.1995 | ||
LU | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 08.03.1995 | |
BE | 08.03.1995 | ||
CH | 08.03.1995 | ||
DK | 08.03.1995 | ||
IT | 08.03.1995 | ||
LI | 08.03.1995 | ||
SE | 08.06.1995 | ||
FR | 04.08.1995 | ||
GB | 23.08.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 08.03.1995 | |
BE | 08.03.1995 | ||
CH | 08.03.1995 | ||
DK | 08.03.1995 | ||
LI | 08.03.1995 | ||
SE | 08.06.1995 | ||
FR | 04.08.1995 | ||
GB | 23.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/30] | AT | 08.03.1995 | |
BE | 08.03.1995 | ||
CH | 08.03.1995 | ||
LI | 08.03.1995 | ||
SE | 08.06.1995 | ||
FR | 04.08.1995 | ||
GB | 23.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | AT | 08.03.1995 | |
BE | 08.03.1995 | ||
CH | 08.03.1995 | ||
LI | 08.03.1995 | ||
SE | 08.06.1995 | ||
FR | 04.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | AT | 08.03.1995 | |
CH | 08.03.1995 | ||
LI | 08.03.1995 | ||
FR | 04.08.1995 | ||
Former [1995/52] | CH | 08.03.1995 | |
LI | 08.03.1995 | ||
FR | 04.08.1995 | ||
Former [1995/36] | CH | 08.03.1995 | |
LI | 08.03.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1074230 (JOHN VINCENT DUNLEA JR); | [A]FR1529580 (TEZUKA KOSAN KK); | [A]BE893120 (ESSO TEXTILE CY LTD); | [A]US4346653 (RODAK EDWARD); | [A]EP0130178 (BOKAN SIGISBERT) |