blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0474301

EP0474301 - Cyclohexanone derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.1996
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.12.1996 [1996/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [1992/11]For all designated states
SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Briner, Paul Howard
1 Vicarage Cottage, Shottenden Road, Molash
Canterbury, Kent CT4 8EY / GB
[1992/11]
Representative(s)Allam, Peter Clerk, et al
Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/42]Allam, Peter Clerk, et al
LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand
London WC2R 0AE / GB
Application number, filing date91202226.602.09.1991
[1992/11]
Priority number, dateGB1990001919203.09.1990         Original published format: GB 9019192
GB1990001919403.09.1990         Original published format: GB 9019194
GB1990001919303.09.1990         Original published format: GB 9019193
[1992/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0474301
Date:11.03.1992
Language:EN
[1992/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0474301
Date:08.07.1992
Language:EN
[1992/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0474301
Date:20.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.05.1992
ClassificationIPC:C07C49/697, C07C49/747, C07C49/753, C07C205/45, C07C45/28, C07C45/64, C07D303/32, // C07D233/60, C07D249/08, C07C49/657
[1992/28]
CPC:
C07D231/12 (EP,US); C07C49/697 (EP,KR,US); C07C205/45 (EP,US);
C07C45/292 (EP,US); C07C45/58 (EP,US); C07C49/747 (EP,US);
C07C49/753 (EP,US); C07D233/56 (EP,US); C07D249/08 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
C07C45/292, C07C49/697 (EP,US);
C07C45/58, C07C49/747 (US,EP)
Former IPC [1992/11]C07C49/697, C07C49/747, C07C49/753, C07C205/45, C07C45/29, C07C45/58, C07D303/32, // C07D233/60, C07D249/08
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1992/11]
TitleGerman:Cyclohexanonderivate[1992/11]
English:Cyclohexanone derivatives[1992/11]
French:Dérivés de la cyclohexanone[1992/11]
Examination procedure11.12.1992Examination requested  [1993/05]
01.07.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.12.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.06.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.09.1995Fee for grant paid
12.09.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.09.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
06.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.10.199404   M06   Fee paid on   12.10.1994
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0358259  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL])
 [X]  - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS. vol. 29, no. 32, 1988, OXFORD GB pages 3903 - 3906; B. O¡CONNOR ET AL: 'Palladium-Catalyzed Cyclization of Alkenyl and Aryl Halides Containing alpha, beta - Unsaturated Carbonyl Groups via Intramolecular Carbopalladation.'
 [X]  - JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY vol. 51, 1986, WASHINGTON DC US pages 3400 - 3402; A.P. KOZIKOWSKI ET AL.: 'Phosphoniosilylation: An Efficient and Practical Method for the beta Functionalization of Enones.'
 [X]  - JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY vol. 53, 1988, WASHINGTON DC US pages 5789 - 5791; S.C. BERK ET AL.: 'General Approach to Highly Functionalized Benzylic Organometallics of Zinc and Copper.'
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 102, 1985, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 5743D, NAOSHIMA, Y. ET AL.: 'Synthesis of 2-hydroxy-3-alkyl-2-cyclohexen-1-ones.' page 522 ;column 2 ;
 [XP]  - ORGANOMETALLICS vol. 9, 1990, WASHINGTON, DC pages 3053 - 3064; S.C. BERK ET AL.: 'Preparation and Reactions of Functionalized Benzylic Organometallics of Zinc and Copper.'
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.