EP0476784 - Processes for the preparation of ethers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.1996 [1996/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS COMPANY, INC. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/13] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND PLASTICS COMPANY, INC. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
King, Stephen Wayne 120 Teays Meadows Scott Depot, West Virginia 25560 / US | 02 /
Olson, Kurt Damar 5442 Longview Drive Cross Lanes, West Virginia 25313 / US | [1992/13] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | ||
Former [1992/13] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir. Vereenigde Octrooibureaux, P.O. Box 87930 NL-2508 DH 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 91202429.6 | 19.09.1991 | [1992/13] | Priority number, date | US19900585455 | 20.09.1990 Original published format: US 585455 | [1992/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0476784 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07C41/01, C07C43/10, C07C43/184 | [1992/13] | CPC: |
C07C41/01 (EP,US);
C07C51/00 (KR);
C07C41/16 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C41/01, C07C43/04 (EP,US);
C07C41/16, C07C43/04 (US,EP);
C07C41/16, C07C43/11 (US,EP);
C07C41/16, C07C43/18 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Ethern | [1992/13] | English: | Processes for the preparation of ethers | [1992/13] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'éthers | [1992/13] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 23.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/47] | 08.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/03] | 24.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1996/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1995 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3959391 (ALLAIN RONALD J); | [AD]EP0030397 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [A]US4835321 (LEACH BRUCE E [US], et al) | [AD] - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, no. 8, 1975, Pergamon Press: Oxford, New York, Braun- schweig,pages 593-596 ROGER TAYLOR, "The Thermal Decomposition of Carbonates to Ethers" |