EP0479368 - Pulse-echo system and method for detecting discontinuities [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.1995 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hoogovens Technical Services Inspection Systems BV Uraniumweg 27 3542 AK Utrecht / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/41] | For all designated states Hoogovens Technical Services Inspection Systems BV Uraniumweg 27 NL-3542 AK Utrecht / NL | ||
Former [1992/15] | For all designated states NUCON ENGINEERING & CONTRACTING BV Postbus 4026 NL-1009 AA Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ketelaar, Kees Cornelis Jacobus Tjalkstraat 16 NL-1443 JK Purmerend / NL | [1992/15] | Representative(s) | van Breda, Jacobus, et al HOOGOVENS GROEP BV P.O. Box 10.000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/14] | Van Breda, Jacobus, Mr. Ir., et al HOOGOVENS GROEP BV P.O. Box 10.000 NL-1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | ||
Former [1994/41] | Van Breda, Jacobus Hoogovens Technical Services Inspection Sytems BV P.O. Box 8499 NL-3503 RL Utrecht / NL | ||
Former [1992/15] | Van Breda, Jacobus, Mr. Ir. HOOGOVENS GROEP BV P.O. Box 10.000 NL-1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | Application number, filing date | 91202479.1 | 25.09.1991 | [1992/15] | Priority number, date | NL19900002156 | 04.10.1990 Original published format: NL 9002156 | [1992/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0479368 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0479368 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/00, G01N29/22 | [1992/15] | CPC: |
G01N29/221 (EP);
G01N2291/044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/15] | Title | German: | Impulsechogerät und Verfahren zum Feststellen von Fehlstellen | [1992/15] | English: | Pulse-echo system and method for detecting discontinuities | [1992/15] | French: | Système et méthode à écho d'impulsions pour détecter des discontinuités | [1992/15] | Examination procedure | 25.09.1991 | Examination requested [1992/25] | 11.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 25.09.1995 | ES | 26.09.1995 | SE | 26.09.1995 | BE | 30.09.1995 | CH | 30.09.1995 | LI | 30.09.1995 | [2004/28] |
Former [1997/13] | GB | 25.09.1995 | |
SE | 26.09.1995 | ||
BE | 30.09.1995 | ||
CH | 30.09.1995 | ||
LI | 30.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/47] | GB | 25.09.1995 | |
SE | 26.09.1995 | ||
BE | 30.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/31] | SE | 26.09.1995 | |
BE | 30.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/30] | SE | 26.09.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4502330 ; | [A]US3481425 ; | [AD]US4022055 |