EP0480505 - Radiotransmission system with a plurality of subscriber devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1999 [1999/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1997/35] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1996/16] | For:FR
PHILIPS COMMUNICATION D'ENTREPRISE 88 rue Brillat Savarin F-75013 Paris / FR | ||
For:DE
GB
IT
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1992/16] | For:FR
T.R.T. TELECOMMUNICATIONS RADIOELECTRIQUES ET TELEPHONIQUES 88, rue Brillat Savarin F-75013 Paris / FR | ||
For:DE
GB
IT
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Travers, Jean-François, Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | 02 /
Briand, Jacques, Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | 03 /
Guedes, Yvon, Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1998/26] |
Former [1992/16] | 01 /
Travers, Jean-François, Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard aussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
Briand, Jacques, Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard aussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | |||
03 /
Guedes, Yvon, Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard aussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Chaffraix, Jean, et al Société Civile SPID, 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | Chaffraix, Jean, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91202543.4 | 01.10.1991 | [1992/16] | Priority number, date | FR19900012416 | 09.10.1990 Original published format: FR 9012416 | [1992/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0480505 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0480505 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04Q7/22 | [1998/30] | CPC: |
H04B7/2643 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/16] | H04B7/26, H04Q7/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/16] | Title | German: | Funkübertragungssystem mit einer Anzahl von Teilnehmerendgeräten | [1992/16] | English: | Radiotransmission system with a plurality of subscriber devices | [1992/16] | French: | Système de transmission radioélectrique comportant une pluralité de dispositifs d'abonné | [1992/16] | Examination procedure | 24.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/49] | 30.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0209185 (TRT TELECOM RADIO ELECTR [FR], et al); | [A]EP0334746 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) | [X] - 39TH IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE vol. II, Mai 1989, SAN-FRANCISCO (US) pages 712 - 717; A. MALOBERTI: 'RADIO TRANSMISSION INTERFACE OF THE DIGITAL PANEUROPEAN MOBILE SYSTEM' | [A] - * page 714, colonne de droite, ligne 58 - ligne 77 * | [X] - INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM vol. 3, Mars 1987, PHOENIX (US) pages 759 - 765; P. ROBERT ET AL: 'ALCATEL LAND MOBILE SYSTEM CD900 A FULLY DIGITAL CELLULAR APPROACH USING WIDEBAND TDMA' | Examination | EP0261127 |