EP0471422 - Postmix juice dispensing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.1994 [1994/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Coca-Cola Company 310 North Avenue, P.O.Box 1734 Atlanta Georgia 30313 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/08] | For all designated states THE COCA-COLA COMPANY 310 North Avenue, P.O.Box 1734 Atlanta, Georgia 30313 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kirschner, Jonathan 5224 Old Mountain Lane, NW Powder Springs, Georgia 30073-4341 / US | 02 /
Smazik, Kenneth G. 228 Westwood Drive Marietta, Georgia 30064 / US | 03 /
Paisley, Gary V. 5463 Breathitt Drive Lilburn, Georgia 30247 / US | [1992/32] |
Former [1992/08] | 01 /
Kirschner, Jonathan 707 Franklin Road, Apt. 17-2 Marietta, Georgia 30067 / US | ||
02 /
Smazik, Kenneth G. 228 Westwood Drive Marietta, Georgia 30064 / US | |||
03 /
Paisley, Gary V. 5463 Breathitt Drive Lilburn, Georgia 30247 / US | Representative(s) | Piésold, Alexander James, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | Piesold, Alexander J., et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | ||
Former [1992/08] | Piesold, Alexander James Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91202734.9 | 23.12.1988 | [1992/08] | Priority number, date | US19870137307 | 23.12.1987 Original published format: US 137307 | [1992/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0471422 | Date: | 19.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0471422 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/00, B67D1/06 | [1992/19] | CPC: |
B67D1/1234 (EP,US);
B67D99/00 (KR);
B67D1/0037 (EP,US);
B67D1/1218 (EP,US);
B67D1/1256 (EP,US);
B67D1/1277 (EP,US);
B67D2001/0828 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1992/08] | B67D1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, SE [1992/08] | Title | German: | Abgabevorrichtung für Fruchtsaftgetränke mit späterem Mischen | [1992/08] | English: | Postmix juice dispensing system | [1992/08] | French: | Distributeur de jus de fruit formé par mélange ultérieur | [1992/08] | Examination procedure | 26.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/52] | 25.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/48] | 06.07.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/48] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP88312302.8 / EP0322253 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1539329 ; | [A]EP0102527 (COCA COLA CO [US]); | [AP]EP0266201 (COCA COLA CO [US]) |