EP0483931 - Cigar-like tobacco product and method of making such product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/19] | Tobacco product and method of making such product | ||
[1997/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LA PAZ SIGARENFABRIEKEN B.V. Van Hornstraat 68 NL-5282 ND Boxtel / NL | [1992/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Glabbeek, Arnoldus Henricus Johannes Gerardus Zevenberg 25 NL-5508 AH Veldhoven / NL | [1992/19] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J. Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir. Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | ||
Former [1992/19] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir. Vereenigde Octrooibureaux, P.O. Box 87930 NL-2508 DH 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 91202835.4 | 31.10.1991 | [1992/19] | Priority number, date | NL19900002383 | 01.11.1990 Original published format: NL 9002383 | [1992/19] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0483931 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0483931 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A24B13/00, A24D1/00 | [1992/19] | CPC: |
A24D1/00 (EP,US);
A24B13/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1992/19] | Title | German: | Zigarrenähnliches Tabakprodukt und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines solchen Produktes | [1997/02] | English: | Cigar-like tobacco product and method of making such product | [1997/02] | French: | Produit de tabac ressemblant à un cigare et méthode de fabrication d'un tel produit | [1997/02] |
Former [1992/19] | Tabakprodukt und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines solchen Produktes | ||
Former [1992/19] | Tobacco product and method of making such product | ||
Former [1992/19] | Produit de tabac et méthode de fabrication d'un tel produit | Examination procedure | 05.11.1992 | Examination requested [1992/53] | 25.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Request for further processing for: | 24.08.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 24.08.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.09.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE106217 ; | [A]DE57847 ; | [A]FR478650 (CALEB CONLEY DULA [US]); | [A]US1437956 (BLAIR ROBERT S); | [A]US1520761 (MCLEAN LEE A); | [A]CH120791 (AUSTRIA A G ERZEUGUNG & VERTRI [CH]); | [A]DE862117 (GAERTHOEFFNER HERMANN); | [A]FR1168467 |