EP0487136 - Thread-laying device with rotating thread-guide elements on two converging inclined planes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.04.1994 [1994/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAVIO S.p.A. Via Udine 105 33170 Pordenone / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | For all designated states SAVIO S.p.A. Via Udine 105 I-33170 Pordenone / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prodi, Paolo Via Cavour, 3 I-48100 Ravenna / IT | [1992/22] | Representative(s) | De Carli, Erberto, et al ING. BARZANO & ZANARDO MILANO S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | De Carli, Erberto, et al ING. BARZANO & ZANARDO MILANO S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 91202925.3 | 12.11.1991 | [1992/22] | Priority number, date | IT19900022174 | 23.11.1990 Original published format: IT 2217490 | [1992/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0487136 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65H54/28 | [1992/22] | CPC: |
B65H54/2839 (EP,US);
B65H54/00 (KR);
B65H2701/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/22] | Title | German: | Fadenablegevorrichtung mit rotierenden Fadenmitnehmerarmen auf zwei konvergierenden schiefen Ebenen | [1992/22] | English: | Thread-laying device with rotating thread-guide elements on two converging inclined planes | [1992/22] | French: | Dispositif poseur de fil comportant des guide-fils rotatifs, disposés dans deux plans incinés convergents | [1992/22] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 30.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/48] | 01.03.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0382104 (TEIJIN SEIKI CO LTD [JP]) |