EP0488452 - Multilayer composite material, in particular multilayer thermoplastic film, and relevant formed articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.1995 [1995/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAFTA S.P.A. Via Arda 11 I-29100 Piacenza / IT | [1992/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Navarini, Franco, Dr. Via Manfredi 122/B I-29100 Piacenza / IT | [1992/23] | Representative(s) | Incollingo, Italo Piazzale Lavater, 3 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | Incollingo, Italo Piazzale Lavater, 3 I-20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 91203047.5 | 21.11.1991 | [1992/23] | Priority number, date | IT19900002222 | 29.11.1990 Original published format: IT 222290 | [1992/23] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0488452 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0488452 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/08, B32B27/32, B32B27/36, B65D77/20 | [1992/31] | CPC: |
B32B15/08 (EP);
B32B7/12 (US);
B32B15/09 (US);
B32B15/20 (US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B27/36 (US);
B65D77/2056 (EP);
B32B2311/24 (US);
B32B2323/04 (US);
B32B2367/00 (US);
B32B2375/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [1992/23] | B32B15/08, B32B27/36, B32B27/32, B65D77/20 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1992/23] | Title | German: | Mehrschichtverbundmaterial, insbesondere thermoplastischer Mehrschichtfilm und einschlägig geformte Artikel | [1992/23] | English: | Multilayer composite material, in particular multilayer thermoplastic film, and relevant formed articles | [1992/23] | French: | Matériau composite stratifié, notamment film stratifié thermoplastique et articles formés correspondants | [1992/23] | Examination procedure | 19.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/48] | 01.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/50] | 14.07.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.03.1994 | 30.11.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3381818 (COPE PAUL E, et al) |