blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0490434

EP0490434 - Labelled, modified oligonucleotides [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 08.06.2005  [2005/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Velperweg 76
6824 BM Arnhem / NL
[2000/11]
Former [1994/20]For all designated states
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Velperweg 76
NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Former [1992/25]For all designated states
AKZO N.V.
Velperweg 76
NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Kuijpers, Wilhelmus Henricus Arnoldus
Pisanostraat 334
NL-5623 CK Eindhoven / NL
02 / Kaspersen, Franciscus Michael
Acacialaan 13
NL-5384 BB Heesch / NL
03 / van Boekel, Constant Adriaan Anton
Mercuriusstraat 32
NL-5345 LX Oss / NL
[1992/25]
Representative(s)Hermans, Frans G.M.
Patent Department N.V. Organon P.O. Box 20
5340 BH Oss / NL
[N/P]
Former [1992/25]Hermans, Franciscus G.M.
P.O. Box 20
NL-5340 BH Oss / NL
Application number, filing date91203183.805.12.1991
[1992/25]
Priority number, dateNL1990000271410.12.1990         Original published format: NL 9002714
[1992/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0490434
Date:17.06.1992
Language:EN
[1992/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0490434
Date:15.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.04.1992
ClassificationIPC:C07H21/00, A61K31/70
[1992/25]
CPC:
A61K51/0491 (EP); C07H19/20 (KR); A61K47/6807 (EP);
A61K47/6853 (EP); A61K47/6889 (EP); A61K51/1093 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP); A61P35/00 (EP); A61P37/00 (EP);
C07H21/00 (EP); A61K2121/00 (EP); A61K2123/00 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   SE [1992/25]
TitleGerman:Markierte, modifizierte Oligonokleotiden[1992/25]
English:Labelled, modified oligonucleotides[1992/25]
French:Oligonucléotides,marqués et modifiés[1992/25]
Examination procedure10.12.1991Examination requested  [1992/25]
10.08.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.10.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.01.1996Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
05.04.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.1999Fee for grant paid
27.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/09]
Request for further processing for:05.04.1996Request for further processing filed
05.04.1996Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.04.1996Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
15.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
02.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
04.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
05.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.03.2000
BE15.03.2000
CH15.03.2000
GR15.03.2000
LI15.03.2000
NL15.03.2000
SE15.03.2000
DK15.06.2000
LU05.12.2000
[2005/23]
Former [2004/07]AT15.03.2000
BE15.03.2000
CH15.03.2000
GR15.03.2000
LI15.03.2000
NL15.03.2000
SE15.03.2000
DK15.06.2000
Former [2003/45]AT15.03.2000
BE15.03.2000
CH15.03.2000
LI15.03.2000
NL15.03.2000
SE15.03.2000
DK15.06.2000
Former [2003/07]AT15.03.2000
BE15.03.2000
CH15.03.2000
LI15.03.2000
NL15.03.2000
SE15.03.2000
Former [2002/23]AT15.03.2000
BE15.03.2000
CH15.03.2000
LI15.03.2000
SE15.03.2000
Former [2001/08]AT15.03.2000
BE15.03.2000
CH15.03.2000
LI15.03.2000
Former [2000/52]CH15.03.2000
LI15.03.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]WO8805077  (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [CH]);
 [X]WO8905853  (SYNTHETIC GENETICS [US]);
 [X]WO8906702  (CHEMEX PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]);
 [X]WO8912110  (BIOGEN INC [US]);
 [X]WO9010448  (GENENTECH INC [US]);
 [X]WO9012802  (US HEALTH [US])
ExaminationWO8910140
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.