EP0492718 - Automatic sweep-to-lock circuit for a phase-locked loop [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.1994 [1994/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAGNAVOX ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS COMPANY (a Delaware corp.) 1313 Production Road Fort Wayne Indiana 46808 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states MAGNAVOX ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS COMPANY (a Delaware corp.) 1313 Production Road Fort Wayne Indiana 46808 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foell, John Daniel c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1992/27] | Representative(s) | de Jongh, Cornelis Dominicus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | De Jongh, Cornelis Dominicus, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 91203333.9 | 18.12.1991 | [1992/27] | Priority number, date | US19900631522 | 21.12.1990 Original published format: US 631522 | [1992/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0492718 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0492718 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H03L7/12 | [1992/27] | CPC: |
H03L7/095 (EP,US);
H03L7/12 (EP,US);
Y10S331/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/27] | Title | German: | Automatische Fangschaltung mit Suchlauf für einen Phasenregelkreis | [1992/27] | English: | Automatic sweep-to-lock circuit for a phase-locked loop | [1992/27] | French: | Circuit de verrouillage automatique par balayage pour une boucle à verrouillage de phase | [1992/27] | File destroyed: | 15.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 26.05.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/06] | 30.08.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2368178 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) |