EP0450742 - DTPA-Monoamids, pharmaceutical compositions containing them, their use and process for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.06.1995 [1995/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Aktiengesellschaft 13342 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | For all designated states SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-13342 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gries, Heinz, Dr. Helmstedter Str. 19 W-1000 Berlin 31 / DE | 02 /
Klieger, Erich, Dr. Augsburger Str. 25 W-1000 Berlin 30 / DE | 03 /
Radüchel, Bernd, Dr. Gollanczstr. 132 W-1000 Berlin 28 / DE | 04 /
Schmitt-Willich, Heribert, Dr. Gardeschützenweg 102 W-1000 Berlin 45 / DE | 05 /
Weinmann, Hanns-Joachim, Dr. Westhofener Weg 23 W-1000 Berlin 38 / DE | 06 /
Vogler, Hubert, Dr. Dahlmannstr. 10 W-1000 Berlin 12 / DE | 07 /
Schuhmann-Giampieri, Gabriele, Dr. Marschnerstr. 34 W-1000 Berlin 45 / DE | 08 /
Conrad, Jürgen, Dr. Ahornstr. 28 W-1000 Berlin 41 / DE | [1991/41] | Application number, filing date | 91250089.9 | 05.04.1991 | [1991/41] | Priority number, date | DE19904011684 | 06.04.1990 Original published format: DE 4011684 | [1991/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0450742 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0450742 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07C237/04, C07C237/12, C07C309/15, C07C309/51, A61K49/00, A61K49/02, A61K49/04 | [1991/41] | CPC: |
C07F5/003 (EP,US);
A61K49/06 (EP,US);
C07C237/04 (EP,US);
C07C237/12 (EP,US);
C07F15/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/41] | Title | German: | DTPA-Monoamide, diese Verbindungen enthaltende pharmazeutische Mittel, ihre Verwendung und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1991/41] | English: | DTPA-Monoamids, pharmaceutical compositions containing them, their use and process for their preparation | [1991/41] | French: | DTPA-monoamides, compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant, leur utilisation et procédé pour leur préparation | [1991/41] | Examination procedure | 08.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/41] | 30.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 14.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/26] | Request for further processing for: | 14.04.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 14.04.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.05.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2060623 (ANALYTICAL RADIATION CORP); | [AD]EP0130934 ; | [A]EP0263059 (SCHERING AG [DE]); | [AD]WO8807521 (SCHERING AG [DE]); | [AP]EP0405704 (SCHERING AG [DE]) |