EP0464973 - Medical device generating an alternating flow for driving implantable blood pumps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Affeld, Klaus, Prof. Dr. Ing. Niebuhrstrasse 11a D-10629 Berlin / DE | [1992/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | Linser, Heinz, et al Patentanwalt Fichtestrasse 8 16548 Glienicke/Nordb. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/34] | Linser, Heinz, et al Patentanwalt Fichtestrasse 8 D-16548 Glienicke/Nordb. / DE | ||
Former [1994/48] | Linser, Heinz Robert-Bosch-Strasse 12a D-63303 Dreieich / DE | Application number, filing date | 91250163.2 | 20.06.1991 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | DE19904020120 | 25.06.1990 Original published format: DE 4020120 | [1992/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0464973 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0464973 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/10, A61M1/12, F04D29/04 | [1992/02] | CPC: |
F04D15/0027 (EP,US);
A61M60/196 (EP,US);
A61M60/427 (EP,US);
A61M60/43 (EP,US);
A61M60/435 (EP,US);
A61M60/538 (EP,US);
A61M60/894 (EP,US);
F04D29/042 (EP,US);
F04D29/506 (EP,US);
A61M60/148 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/02] | Title | German: | Medizinische Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung eines alternierenden Volumenstroms für den Antrieb von implantierbaren Blutpumpen | [1992/02] | English: | Medical device generating an alternating flow for driving implantable blood pumps | [1992/02] | French: | Dispositif médical produisant un courant volumétrique alternatif pour la commande de pompes implantables pour le sang | [1996/01] |
Former [1992/02] | Dispositif médical produisant un courrant volumétrique alternatif pour la commande de pompes implantables pour le sang | Examination procedure | 11.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/47] | 07.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.08.1992 | M01   Fee paid on   11.09.1992 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.09.1993 | 30.06.1994 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   03.11.1994 | 30.06.1995 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.09.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 03.01.1996 | DK | 03.01.1996 | ES | 03.01.1996 | IT | 03.01.1996 | SE | 03.04.1996 | [2002/25] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 03.01.1996 | |
DK | 03.01.1996 | ||
IT | 03.01.1996 | ||
SE | 03.04.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 03.01.1996 | |
DK | 03.01.1996 | ||
SE | 03.04.1996 | ||
Former [1996/51] | BE | 03.01.1996 | |
SE | 03.04.1996 | ||
Former [1996/38] | SE | 03.04.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CH143798 (FRANCKE W H [CH]); | [A]DE1528798 (REGULATOR AG); | [A]DE2107000 (LOEWE PUMPENFABRIK GMBH); | [A]US4382199 (ISAACSON MILTON S); | [A]US4888011 (KUNG ROBERT T V [US], et al) | [Y] - BIOMEDIZINISCHE TECHNIK Bd. 19, Nr. 6, 1974, BERLIN Seiten 217 - 224; G.GEISSELBRECHT ET AL: 'EIN INKORPORIERBARES ANTRIEBSSYSTEM FÜR BLUTPUMPEN ZUR ENTLASTUNG DES DES LINKEN HERZENS ' |