EP0527271 - Resin composition having biodegradability and high absorbency nonwoven fabric made of the same and pads comprising said fabric [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.1999 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.1999 [1999/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Research Institute of Chemical Technology Daedeog-danji, 100 Chang-don Chung-ku Daejun-si / KR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/07] | For all designated states KOREA RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY Daedeog-danji, 100 Chang-don Chung-ku, Daejun-si / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Haibang 103-901 Hyundae, Apt.431 Doryong-dong Yousung-ku, Daehun-si / KR | 02 /
Shin, Byungchul 6-303 Samjung Apt. Bum-dong Daeduk-ku Daehun-si / KR | 03 /
Yuk, Soonhong 5-1305 Kolon Apt. Nae-dong Seo-ku, Deajun-si / KR | [1993/07] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 33 01 30 D-14171 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1993/07] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach D-14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 91250175.6 | 02.07.1991 | [1993/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0527271 | Date: | 17.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08L5/04, A61L15/28, D01F9/04, // D04H3/00 ,(C08L5/04, 33:00, 79:00) | [1993/07] | CPC: |
D04H1/46 (EP,US);
A61L15/12 (KR);
C08L101/02 (EP,US);
C08L33/02 (EP,US);
C08L5/04 (EP,US);
D04H1/4266 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L101/02, C08L2666/26 (US,EP);
C08L33/02, C08L2666/26 (US,EP);
C08L5/04, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/07] | Title | German: | Biologisch abbaubare Polymerzusammensetzung mit hoher Absorptionsfähigkeit; daraus hergestellte, nicht gewebte Stoffe; aus dieser Stoffen hergestellte Tampons | [1993/07] | English: | Resin composition having biodegradability and high absorbency nonwoven fabric made of the same and pads comprising said fabric | [1993/07] | French: | Composition de résines biodégradables et à fort pouvoir absorbant; non-tissé obtenu à partir de celle-ci, et tampons comprenant ce non-tissé | [1993/07] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/21] | 23.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/51] | 28.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1999/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1998 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   10.09.1998 | 31.07.1999 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2902479 (MCNEELY WILLIAM H, et al); | [Y]GB920811 (KELCO CO); | [Y]FR1541261 ; | [X]FR2331592 (KAO CORP [JP]); | [A]GB2103993 (TONG DAVID PHILIP [GB]); | [A]EP0126824 (LACLEDE PROFESSIONAL PROD [US]); | [A]EP0334167 (KNOLL AG [DE]) | [A] - BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS vol. 4, no. 9, 1982, pages 611 - 614; SUHAILA M. ET AL.: 'Physical properties of polyethyleneimine-alginate gels' |