EP0469693 - Impact resistent molding materials of polyamide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1997 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.05.1997 [1997/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Buna Sow Leuna Olefinverbund GmbH 06258 Schkopau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/51] | For all designated states Buna Sow Leuna Olefinverbund GmbH D-06258 Schkopau / DE | ||
Former [1992/06] | For all designated states BUNA GMBH D-06258 Schkopau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerecke, Jochen, Dr. Bl. 213/8 O-4090 Halle / DE | 02 /
Gruber, Klaus Wachtelweg 70 O-4020 Halle / DE | 03 /
Schütz, Ullrich, Dr. Alfred-Schneider-Strasse 45 O-4014 Halle / DE | 04 /
Wulff, Dirk, Dr. Bl. 953/10 O-4090 Halle / DE | 05 /
Thiele, Klaus, Dr. Seebener Strasse 121 O-4020 Halle / DE | 06 /
Hofmann, Tatjana Bl. 670/1 O-4090 Halle / DE | 07 /
Häussler, Lutz, Dr. Bl. 118/4 O-4090 Halle / DE | 08 /
Brose, Petra Erich-Weinert-Strasse 15 O-4070 Halle / DE | [1992/06] | Application number, filing date | 91250206.9 | 25.07.1991 | [1992/06] | Priority number, date | DD20080003432 | 02.08.1990 Original published format: DD 343208 | DE19914123963 | 19.07.1991 Original published format: DE 4123963 | [1992/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0469693 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0469693 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0469693 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08L77/06, C08L77/02, C08L51/06, // (C08L77/06, 51:06),(C08L77/02, 51:06),(C08L51/06, 77:02),(C08L51/06, 77:06) | [1992/06] | CPC: |
C08L23/04 (EP);
C08L23/06 (EP);
C08L23/10 (EP);
C08L23/142 (EP);
C08L51/06 (EP);
C08L77/00 (EP);
C08L77/02 (EP);
C08L77/06 (EP);
C08L23/0815 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/04, C08L2666/20 (EP);
C08L23/06, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L51/06, C08L2666/14 (EP);
C08L77/00, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L77/00, C08L2666/04 (EP);
C08L77/00, C08L2666/24 (EP);
C08L77/02, C08L2666/04 (EP);
C08L77/02, C08L2666/24 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, FR, IT, NL [1992/06] | Title | German: | Schlagzähe Polyamid-Formmassen | [1992/06] | English: | Impact resistent molding materials of polyamide | [1992/06] | French: | Matières à mouler de polyamide avec résistance au choc | [1992/06] | Examination procedure | 03.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/18] | 07.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4174358 (EPSTEIN BENNETT N [US]); | [A]EP0050471 (MONSANTO CO [US]); | [A]EP0180302 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) | Examination | WO8806174 | EP0403109 | WO9107467 | WO9118053 |