EP0441476 - Master cylinder apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.10.1993 [1993/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company Brueton House, New Road Solihull West Midlands B91 3TX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/33] | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Brueton House, New Road Solihull, West Midlands B91 3TX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Campbell, Roy The Corner House, 1 Marlbrook Lane Lickey Rock, Bromsgrove, B60 1HP / GB | 02 /
Price, Anthony George 14 Meadow Lane Croesycieliog, Cwnbran, Gwent, NP44 2EY / GB | [1991/33] | Representative(s) | Waite, Anthony William, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/33] | Waite, Anthony William, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 91300068.3 | 04.01.1991 | [1991/33] | Priority number, date | GB19900000299 | 06.01.1990 Original published format: GB 9000299 | [1991/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0441476 | Date: | 14.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0441476 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60T11/16 | [1991/33] | CPC: |
B60T11/20 (EP);
B60T11/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1991/33] | Title | German: | Hauptzylinder | [1991/33] | English: | Master cylinder apparatus | [1991/33] | French: | Maître-cylindre | [1991/33] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 19.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/02] | 12.08.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2098686 ; | [A]FR2254729 ; | [A]GB1603849 |