EP0437338 - Apparatus and process for the prevention of acid gas excursions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.04.1995 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 24.05.1995 [1995/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LYONDELL PETROCHEMICAL COMPANY One Houston Center, Suite 1600, 1221 McKinney Street Houston Texas 77253-3646 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/29] | For all designated states LYONDELL PETROCHEMICAL COMPANY One Houston Center, Suite 1600, 1221 McKinney Street Houston, Texas 77253-3646 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scott, David E. 9510 Sandstone Dr. Houston, Texas 77036 / US | 02 /
Celaya, Phillip 6710-1/2 Brace Houston, Texas 77061 / US | 03 /
McCune, Brent 2401 Repsdorph, No. 1206 Seabrook, Texas 77586 / US | 04 /
Wellborn, Tom 2007 Roanwood Drive Houston, Texas 77090 / US | [1991/29] | Representative(s) | Myerscough, Philip Boyd, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [1991/29] | Application number, filing date | 91300110.3 | 08.01.1991 | [1991/29] | Priority number, date | US19900461613 | 08.01.1990 Original published format: US 461613 | [1991/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0437338 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/29] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0437338 | Date: | 19.12.1991 | [1992/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/14, B01D53/18 | [1991/29] | CPC: |
B01D53/1412 (EP);
B01D53/1493 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/29] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Verhinderung von Austritt sauren Gases | [1991/29] | English: | Apparatus and process for the prevention of acid gas excursions | [1991/29] | French: | Appareil et procédé d'empêchement de la sortie de gaz acide | [1991/29] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 15.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/50] | 08.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.12.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/21] | 06.01.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1995 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE3518368 [ ]; | AT238145B [ ]; | GB2014183 [ ]; | GB1362384 [ ] |