EP0442604 - Safety device for trocars and surgical instruments therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.06.1994 [1994/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United States Surgical Corporation 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk Connecticut 06856 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states United States Surgical Corporation 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US | ||
Former [1991/34] | For all designated states UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORPORATION 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06850 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Green, David T. 28 Bermuda Road Westport CT 06880 / US | 02 /
Young, Wayne P. Allview Avenue Brewster NY 10509 / US | [1991/34] | Representative(s) | Marsh, Roy David, et al Hoffmann Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | Marsh, Roy David, et al Hoffmann Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/34] | Marsh, Roy David Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Midsummer House 411C Midsummer Boulevard Central Milton Keynes MK9 3BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 91300157.4 | 09.01.1991 | [1991/34] | Priority number, date | US19900479375 | 13.02.1990 Original published format: US 479375 | [1991/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0442604 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0442604 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34, A61M25/00, A61B17/00, A61M39/00 | [1992/06] | CPC: |
A61B17/3494 (EP,US);
A61B17/3462 (EP,US);
A61B17/3496 (EP,US);
A61B17/3474 (EP,US);
A61B2017/347 (EP,US);
A61B2090/08021 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/34] | A61M25/00, A61M39/00, A61B17/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/34] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsvorrichtung für Trokare und dafür geeignete chirurgische Instrumente | [1991/34] | English: | Safety device for trocars and surgical instruments therefor | [1991/34] | French: | Dispositif de sécurité pour trocarts et instruments chirurgicaux connexes | [1991/34] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 13.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/28] | 12.04.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4573981 (MCFARLANE RICHARD H [US]); | [AD]US4654030 (MOLL FREDERIC H [US], et al); | [A]EP0113520 (VANCE PRODUCTS INC [US]) |