EP0438307 - Method of acoustic well logging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.1994 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.12.1994 [1994/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 3225 Gallows Road Fairfax Virginia 22037-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/30] | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 3225 Gallows Road Fairfax, Virginia 22037-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Medlin, William Louis 7611 Chalkstone Street Dallas, Texas 75248 / US | [1991/30] | Representative(s) | Curtis, Philip Anthony Mobil Services Company Limited Patent Department Mobil House 54-60 Victoria Street London SW1E 6QB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/30] | Curtis, Philip Anthony Mobil Services Company Limited Patent Department Mobil House 54-60 Victoria Street London SW1E 6QB / GB | Application number, filing date | 91300359.6 | 17.01.1991 | [1991/30] | Priority number, date | US19900467108 | 18.01.1990 Original published format: US 467108 | [1991/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0438307 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0438307 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0438307 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/40 | [1991/30] | CPC: |
E21B49/006 (EP,US);
G01V1/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB, NL [1991/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur akustischen Bohrlochmessung | [1991/30] | English: | Method of acoustic well logging | [1991/30] | French: | Procédé de mesure acoustique dans un puits | [1991/30] | Examination procedure | 24.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/26] | 25.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0127548 (SCHLUMBERGER LTD [US], et al); | [A]US4641520 (MAO NAI-HSIEN [US]); | [AP]EP0390526 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) |