EP0439292 - Fuel assembly transfer basket for pool type nuclear reactor vessels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/31] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fanning, Alan Wayne 765 South 12th Street San Jose, California 05112 / US | 02 /
Ramsour, Nicholas Lee 1395 Santa Inez Drive San Jose, California 95125 / US | [1991/31] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1991/31] | Smith, Thomas Ian Macdonald London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Burdett House 15-16 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 91300399.2 | 18.01.1991 | [1991/31] | Priority number, date | US19900469984 | 25.01.1990 Original published format: US 469984 | [1991/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0439292 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0439292 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G21C19/20 | [1991/31] | CPC: |
G21C19/20 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/31] | Title | German: | Brennstabbündelladekorb für Schwimmbeckenkernreaktor | [1991/31] | English: | Fuel assembly transfer basket for pool type nuclear reactor vessels | [1991/31] | French: | Hotte de transfert pour assemblage de combustible prévu pour une cuve de réacteur nucléaire du type piscine | [1991/31] | Examination procedure | 16.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/08] | 29.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 12.07.1995 | GB | 18.01.1996 | [2008/02] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 12.07.1995 | |
GB | 18.01.1996 | ||
Former [1997/17] | GB | 18.01.1996 | |
Former [1997/14] | GB | 18.01.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1464967 (GULF GENERAL ATOMIC INC); | [A]FR2158491 (BRITISH NUCLEAR DESIGN CONSTR); | [A]FR2337920 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK [GB]) |