EP0495280 - Analog to digital convertor with drift compensation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.06.1993 [1993/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/30] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allen, Donald 75 The Square Hursley, Winchester SO 21 2JX / GB | 02 /
Hill, Dominic Laurence 47 Selhurst Way, Fair Oak Eastleigh, Hampshire SO5 7JX / GB | [1992/30] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James, et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/30] | Burt, Roger James, Dr., et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 91300417.2 | 18.01.1991 | [1992/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0495280 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/06, G01L1/22, G01G23/37, G06K11/12 | [1992/30] | CPC: |
G01G23/3714 (EP,US);
G01L1/2256 (EP,US);
G06F3/0383 (EP,US);
H03M1/0607 (EP,US);
H03M1/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/30] | Title | German: | Analog-Digitalwandler mit Driftkompensation | [1992/30] | English: | Analog to digital convertor with drift compensation | [1992/30] | French: | Convertisseur analogique-numérique à compensation de dérive | [1992/30] | File destroyed: | 07.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 13.04.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.03.1993 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4618848 (PARFITT STEVEN P [US]); | [A]EP0103468 (DEERE & CO [US]); | [A]EP0201415 (INOVELF SA [FR]); | [A]DE3202497 (BIZERBA WERKE KRAUT KG WILH [DE]) |