Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2918710B | Global Dossier | 12.07.1999 | B2 | JPH04363398 | 16.12.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9001285 | 19.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU640979B | Global Dossier | 09.09.1993 | B2 | AU6938991 | 25.07.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9001285 | 19.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0438320 | Global Dossier | 19.02.1992 | A3 | EP0438320 | 24.07.1991 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB9001285 | 19.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9100127 | 22.10.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9001285 | 19.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2034244 | 30.11.1999 | C | CA2034244 | 20.07.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9001285 | 19.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9001285D0 | 21.03.1990 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9001285 | 19.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN171897 | 30.01.1993 | B | Priority number | Date | GB9001285 | 19.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR960000207B | 03.01.1996 | B1 | KR910014499 | 31.08.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9001285 | 19.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY107892 | 29.06.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9001285 | 19.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR27438 | 24.05.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9001285 | 19.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA91385 | 30.09.1992 | B | Priority number | Date | GB9001285 | 19.01.1990 |