EP0438320 - Detergent compositions and process for preparing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.12.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [1991/30] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Evans, David George 14 Picton Close Oxton, Birkenhead L43 2NS / GB | 02 /
McLeod, Gordon George 68 Shaftesbury Avenue Vicars Cross, Chester CH3 5LH / GB | 03 /
Peter, Donald 74 Eton Drive Thornton Hough, Wirral L63 1JS / GB | 04 /
Yuregir, Korkut Remzi 43 Meadowcroft, Heswall Wirral, Merseyside L60 1UU / GB | [1991/30] | Representative(s) | Agnew, Andrew, et al Unilever plc Patent Department Colworth House Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | Agnew, Andrew, et al Unilever plc Patent Department Colworth House Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2001/14] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2000/44] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Lloyd Wise, Treager & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | ||
Former [1995/01] | Ford, Michael Frederick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1991/30] | Ford, Michael Frederick MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 91300422.2 | 18.01.1991 | [1991/30] | Priority number, date | GB19900001285 | 19.01.1990 Original published format: GB 9001285 | [1991/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0438320 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0438320 | Date: | 19.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C11D11/00, C11D17/06, C11D11/04, C11D3/00 | [1992/08] | CPC: |
C11D11/04 (EP);
C11D1/00 (KR);
C11D17/065 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/30] | C11D17/06, C11D11/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/30] | Title | German: | Reinigungsmittel und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1991/30] | English: | Detergent compositions and process for preparing them | [1991/30] | French: | Compositions détergentes et leur procédé de préparation | [1991/30] | Examination procedure | 13.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/20] | 26.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.06.1998 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.11.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2003/04] | 10.10.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/04] | Appeal following examination | 02.02.1999 | Appeal received No. T0445/99 | 07.04.1999 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.02.2000 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M06) [2000/10] | 04.09.2000 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2000/36] | 22.01.2001 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2001/04] | 23.05.2001 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2001/21] | 10.10.2002 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 10.10.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.10.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XPD]EP0352135 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al); | [Y]EP0340013 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al); | [Y]GB2209172 (UNILEVER PLC [GB]); | [AD]FR2124284 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO); | [AP]WO9001536 (PATERSON ZOCHONIS UK LTD [GB]) |