EP0440381 - Improvements relating to electrodeless high intensity discharge lamps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.1995 [1995/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borowiec, Joseph Christopher 1519 Nott Street Schenectady, New York 12308 / US | 02 /
El-Hamamsy, Sayed-Amr Ahmes 2120 Van Rensselaer Drive Schenectady, New York 12308 / US | [1991/32] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/13] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1991/32] | Smith, Thomas Ian Macdonald London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Burdett House 15-16 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 91300576.5 | 25.01.1991 | [1991/32] | Priority number, date | US19900472144 | 30.01.1990 Original published format: US 472144 | [1991/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0440381 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0440381 | Date: | 21.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/02, H05B41/29, H01J65/04 | [1992/43] | CPC: |
H05B41/02 (EP,US);
H05B41/2806 (EP,US);
Y02B20/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/32] | H05B41/02, H05B41/29 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/32] | Title | German: | Verbesserungen bezüglich elektrodloser Lampen mit starker Entladung | [1991/32] | English: | Improvements relating to electrodeless high intensity discharge lamps | [1991/32] | French: | Améliorations concernant des lampes à forte décharge sans électrodes | [1991/32] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 20.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/24] | 12.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/47] | 22.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ED]US5030889 (EL-HAMAMSY SAYED-AMR A [US], et al); | [A]US3860854 (HOLLISTER DONALD D); | [A]US4383203 (STANLEY CHARLES A) |