EP0454288 - Electrode structure with constant velocity and predetermined reflectivity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.1997 [1997/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R.F. MONOLITHICS, INC. 4441 Sigma Road Dallas Texas 75234 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/44] | For all designated states R.F. MONOLITHICS, INC. 4441 Sigma Road Dallas, Texas 75234 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wright, Peter 5808 Still Forest Drive Dallas, Texas 75252 / US | [1991/44] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/44] | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 91300587.2 | 25.01.1991 | [1991/44] | Priority number, date | US19900510964 | 19.04.1990 Original published format: US 510964 | [1991/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0454288 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0454288 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/145, H03H9/02 | [1991/44] | CPC: |
H03H9/02842 (EP,US);
H03H9/02637 (EP,US);
H03H9/02771 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/44] | Title | German: | Elektrodenstruktur mit konstanter Geschwindigkeit und vorbestimmtem Reflexionsvermögen | [1991/44] | English: | Electrode structure with constant velocity and predetermined reflectivity | [1991/44] | French: | Structure d'électrode à vitesse constante et pouvoir réflecteur prédéterminé | [1991/44] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/25: Teilanmeldung 95108624.8 eingereicht am 25/01/91 | EPB 1996/25: Divisional application 95108624.8 filed on 25/01/91 | EPB 1996/25: Demande divisionnaire 95108624.8 déposée le 25/01/91 | Examination procedure | 16.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/25] | 16.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP95108624.8 / EP0671813 | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2437108 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]US4162465 (HANMA KENTARO [JP], et al); | [A]US4210883 (HUNT WILLIAM D [US], et al) | [Y] - NACHRICHTEN ELEKTRONIK. vol. 34, no. 8, August 1980, HEIDELBERG DE pages 263 - 266; SCHMITT: 'Signalverarbeitung mit akustischen Oberflächenwellen ' | Examination | - US 4,731,595 [WRIGHT] |