EP0440419 - Composite kaolin pigment for paper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.09.1992 [1992/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENGELHARD CORPORATION 101 Wood Avenue Iselin New Jersey 08830-0770 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | For all designated states ENGELHARD CORPORATION 101 Wood Avenue Iselin, New Jersey 08830-0770 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nemeh, Saad 74 Linden Avenue West Long Branch, New Jersey 07764 / US | 02 /
Berube, Richard T. 8 Regal Court Holmdel, New Jersey 07733 / US | 03 /
Kostelnik, Robert T. 7 Pembroke Terrace Belle Mead, New Jersey 07940 / US | 04 /
Mack, Stanley S. 18 Coursen Way Madison, New Jersey 07940 / US | [1991/32] | Representative(s) | Geering, Keith Edwin, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | Geering, Keith Edwin, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 91300668.0 | 29.01.1991 | [1991/32] | Priority number, date | US19900471304 | 29.01.1990 Original published format: US 471304 | US19900494289 | 16.03.1990 Original published format: US 494289 | US19910638274 | 07.01.1991 Original published format: US 638274 | [1991/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0440419 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D21H17/68, D21H19/40 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
D21H19/40 (EP);
D21H17/68 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/32] | Title | German: | Für Papier hergestellte Pigmente aus Gemischen von Kaolin | [1991/32] | English: | Composite kaolin pigment for paper | [1991/32] | French: | Pigment composite à base de kaolin pour le papier | [1991/32] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 05.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 11.07.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0245553 ; | [XD]EP0260945 ; | [XD]US4772332 |