EP0440429 - Polyphenylene sulfide resin composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 23.10.1998 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 746-8501 / JP | For all designated states Toso Susteel Co., Ltd. 7-7, Akasaka 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states Tosoh Corporation 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken, 746 / JP | ||
For all designated states Toso Susteel Co., Ltd. 7-7, Akasaka 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [1991/32] | For all designated states Tosoh Corporation 4560 Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi, Mie-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states Toso Susteel Co., Ltd. 7-7, Akasaka 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanayama, Kyoko 3303, Yamate-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie-ken / JP | 02 /
Inoue, Hiroshi 5-8, Betsumei, 3-chome Yokkaichi-shi, Mie-ken / JP | [1991/32] | Representative(s) | Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas, et al KILBURN & STRODE 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas, et al KILBURN & STRODE 30 John Street London, WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 91300685.4 | 30.01.1991 | [1991/32] | Priority number, date | JP19900022091 | 02.02.1990 Original published format: JP 2209190 | [1991/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0440429 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0440429 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0440429 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0440429 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08L81/02, // (C08L81/02, 77:00) | [1991/32] | CPC: |
C08L81/02 (EP);
C08L81/04 (KR);
C08L77/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L81/02, C08L77/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/32] | Title | German: | Harzzusammensetzung aus Polyphenylensulfiden | [1991/32] | English: | Polyphenylene sulfide resin composition | [1991/32] | French: | Composition de poly(sulfure de phénylène) | [1991/32] | Examination procedure | 21.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/12] | 29.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.01.1996
20.02.1996
ADMISSIBLE DSM N.V. Patent Department P.O. Box 605 NL-6160 AP Geleen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.01.1996
20.02.1996
ADMISSIBLE DSM N.V. Patent Department P.O. Box 605 NL-6160 AP Geleen / NL | 03.04.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.09.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.10.1996 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.1997 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 20.02.1998 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.03.1998 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.06.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 21.08.1998 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 03.05.1995 | FR | 03.05.1995 | IT | 03.05.1995 | LI | 03.05.1995 | [2008/02] |
Former [2004/35] | CH | 03.05.1995 | |
FR | 03.05.1995 | ||
IT | 03.05.1995 | ||
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | CH | 03.05.1995 | |
IT | 03.05.1995 | ||
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | CH | 03.05.1995 | |
LI | 03.05.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63056559 ; | [A]JP63301252 ; | [A]WO8603212 (STAMICARBON [NL]); | [A]US4528335 (SELBY LARRY M [US], et al); | [AP]EP0405269 (BAYER AG [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 275 (C-516)[3122], 29th July 1988; & JP-A-63 056 559 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER) 11-03-1988, & JP63056559 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 134 (C-581)[3482], 4th April 1989; & JP-A-63 301 252 (UNITIKA) 08-12-1988, & JP63301252 A 00000000 |